NY A03542 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an environment in the workplace that does not discourage witnessing and reporting on abusive behavior and provides penalties for acts of retribution against such person.
Title
Creates an environment in the workplace that does not discourage witnessing and reporting on abusive behavior and provides penalties for acts of retribution against such person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Assembly | held for consideration in mental health |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | print number 3542a |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | referred to mental health |