NY A03724 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding the Ogdensburg foreign trade zone.
Title
Relates to expanding the Ogdensburg foreign trade zone.
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Senate | signed chap.364 |
2011-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.869 |
2011-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5225 |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.457 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-26 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05225 (Same As) 2011-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3724