NY A04413 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the listing of county and city veterans' service agencies; requires the division of veterans' affairs to list information for local veterans' service agencies on its website and to provide such information in its annual report to the governor and legislature.
Title
Relates to the listing of county and city veterans' service agencies; requires the division of veterans' affairs to list information for local veterans' service agencies on its website and to provide such information in its annual report to the governor and legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | approval memo.9 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.453 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.379 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2405 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.138 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02405 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - approval memo.9