NY A04844 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires local solid waste management plans for cities over one million to include a plan for litter control including provision for placement of an adequate number of receptacles for trash and recyclables in commercial and business zones and in public recreational areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires local solid waste management plans for cities over one million to include a plan for litter control including provision for placement of an adequate number of receptacles for trash and recyclables in commercial and business zones and in public recreational areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.127
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.127
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-29Assemblyprint number 4844a
2019-05-29Assemblyamend and recommit to environmental conservation
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S04709 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04844
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04844A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback