NY A05016 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain funds in a qualified tuition program in the calculation of household benefits under public assistance programs.
Title
Exempts certain funds in a qualified tuition program in the calculation of household benefits under public assistance programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.323 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.349 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | substituted for a5016 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.421 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | substituted by s1089 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.349 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01089 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.323