NY A05210 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau and the sale of such parkland for fair market value.
Title
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau and the sale of such parkland for fair market value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.548 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.353 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a5210 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1331 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s104 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.353 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.353 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00104 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.548