NY A05477 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - substituted by s3337c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the statute of limitations for public water suppliers and wholesale water suppliers to commence an action for injury to property shall be three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the statute of limitations for public water suppliers and wholesale water suppliers to commence an action for injury to property shall be three years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assemblysubstituted by s3337c
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.521
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-16Assemblyprint number 5477c
2019-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2019-05-02Assemblyprint number 5477b
2019-05-02Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2019-03-15Assemblyprint number 5477a
2019-03-15Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2019-02-12Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03337 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05477
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05477A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05477B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05477C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback