NY A05883 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the lawful sale of scrap copper and other metals by junk dealers; restricts sale of certain items; increases existing penalties.
Title
Provides for the lawful sale of scrap copper and other metals by junk dealers; restricts sale of certain items; increases existing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.192 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.399 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.399 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | print number 5883b |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | print number 5883a |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S01779 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION