NY A06045 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - signed chap.378
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - signed chap.378
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides beneficiaries with the same allocation of retirement benefits if the member has the service retirement application, disability retirement applications or option election forms postmarked prior to his or her death.
Title
Provides beneficiaries with the same allocation of retirement benefits if the member has the service retirement application, disability retirement applications or option election forms postmarked prior to his or her death.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | signed chap.378 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4141B |
2015-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.357 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.357 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | print number 6045b |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | print number 6045a |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04141 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6045B