NY A06154 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the criminal enforcement of violations of the state's uniform fire prevention and building code.
Title
Relates to the criminal enforcement of violations of the state's uniform fire prevention and building code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | print number 6154a |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00291 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT