NY A06552 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - substituted by s4574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - substituted by s4574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the additional one percent sales tax for Wayne county.
Title
Extends the additional one percent sales tax for Wayne county.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Oaks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s4574 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.122 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-03-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04574 (Same As) 2011-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.229