NY A06793 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to impairments of health, presumption and staph/MRSA.
Title
Relates to impairments of health, presumption and staph/MRSA.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | print number 6793a |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03785 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - referred to ways and means