NY A06947 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Strengthens enforcement efforts of the state's anti-slaughter of race horses and race horse breeding stock law; requires the posting of signage that states it is illegal to sell or transfer such animals for the purposes of slaughter.
Title
Strengthens enforcement efforts of the state's anti-slaughter of race horses and race horse breeding stock law; requires the posting of signage that states it is illegal to sell or transfer such animals for the purposes of slaughter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-04-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.749 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6796A |
2024-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.372 |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | print number 6947a |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S06796 (Same As) 2024-04-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6947A