NY A07073 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the location of presiding judge at arraignment, appearance proceedings and pursuant to a warrant.
Title
Relates to the location of presiding judge at arraignment, appearance proceedings and pursuant to a warrant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | held for consideration in judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04336 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - referred to judiciary