NY A07078 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of waste tire management and recycling fee funds; directs certain funds to be used by the department of economic development for funding demonstration projects relating to reuse in agricultural settings and for conducting analysis of waste tire reuse opportunities.
Title
Relates to the use of waste tire management and recycling fee funds; directs certain funds to be used by the department of economic development for funding demonstration projects relating to reuse in agricultural settings and for conducting analysis of waste tire reuse opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06863 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE