NY A07201 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - signed chap.378
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - signed chap.378
Summary
This bill would authorize the Bethel A.M.E. Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes Bethel A.M.E. Church to file an application for real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Asm. James Conte [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | signed chap.378 | |
2009-08-14 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.769 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3649A | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-18 | ordered to third reading rules cal.499 | |
2009-06-18 | rules report cal.499 | |
2009-06-18 | reported | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-15 | print number 7201a | |
2009-06-15 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | |
2009-03-26 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03649 (Same As) 2009-08-26 - signed chap.378
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07201&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |