NY A07291 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that state lands within the Eastport-South Manor Central School District are subject to taxation for school purposes.
Title
Provides that state lands within the Eastport-South Manor Central School District are subject to taxation for school purposes.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7291a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05270 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT