NY A07315 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes motion picture theatres to serve alcoholic beverages.
Title
Authorizes motion picture theatres to serve alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s4772 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.227 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.227 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-04-29 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04772 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.475