NY A07315 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the use of seatbelts by volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance service workers; provides exception for vehicles which do not have restraint systems provided by the manufacturer or to volunteer firefighters not seated within the confines of the vehicle or emergency medical personnel providing patient care in the rear compartment of an ambulance.
Title
Requires the use of seatbelts by volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance service workers; provides exception for vehicles which do not have restraint systems provided by the manufacturer or to volunteer firefighters not seated within the confines of the vehicle or emergency medical personnel providing patient care in the rear compartment of an ambulance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.448 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4187A |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.665 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.665 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04187 (Same As) 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7315