NY A07326 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits Mount Moriah Baptist Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Permits Mount Moriah Baptist Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.351 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.547 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | substituted for a7326 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.797 |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s5233 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.547 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05233 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.351