NY A07393 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - print number 7393b
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - print number 7393b
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount recipients of enhanced residential care may maintain in a personal allowance account and payments to the aged, blind and disabled.
Title
Increases the amount recipients of enhanced residential care may maintain in a personal allowance account and payments to the aged, blind and disabled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Assembly | print number 7393b |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | print number 7393a |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to social services |
2015-05-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S05151 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE