NY A07473 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to increasing the maximum account balance for the New York ABLE program in accordance with the NY state college choice tuition savings program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to increasing the maximum account balance for the New York ABLE program in accordance with the NY state college choice tuition savings program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.1206
2019-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6238
2019-05-29SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2019-05-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.442
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-06Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S06238 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7473

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07473&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07473&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07473
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07473&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07473&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07473&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7473#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback