NY A07488 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to obtaining written consent from candidates for certain county committees; requires written acceptance, duly acknowledged, from such candidates to be so designated to be filed within ten days of designating petitions for certain committee candidates.
Title
Relates to obtaining written consent from candidates for certain county committees; requires written acceptance, duly acknowledged, from such candidates to be so designated to be filed within ten days of designating petitions for certain committee candidates.
Sponsors
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Asm. Nily Rozic [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | print number 7488a |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05428 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE