NY S05428 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to obtaining written acceptance from candidates for certain county committees; requires written acceptance, duly acknowledged, from such candidates to be so designated to be filed within ten days of designating petitions for certain county committee candidates.
Title
Relates to obtaining written acceptance from candidates for certain county committees; requires written acceptance, duly acknowledged, from such candidates to be so designated to be filed within ten days of designating petitions for certain county committee candidates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5428A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.850 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07488 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to election law