NY A07557 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to truancy allegations in persons in need of supervision and child protective proceedings in family court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to truancy allegations in persons in need of supervision and child protective proceedings in family court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.362
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1838
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5714
2018-03-22SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2018-03-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-22Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.526
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.556
2017-05-23Assemblyreported
2017-05-16Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-05-02Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S05714 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7557

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07557&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07557&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07557
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07557&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07557&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07557&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7557#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback