NY A07570 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the city of Albany to accept from Congregation Ohav Shalom an application for exemption from real property taxes pursuant to section 420-a of the real property tax law for the 2018 rolls.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the city of Albany to accept from Congregation Ohav Shalom an application for exemption from real property taxes pursuant to section 420-a of the real property tax law for the 2018 rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.598 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.177 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7570 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1191 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5400 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.177 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.177 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05400 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.598