NY A07606 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the form of primary ballots; removes color requirement.
Title
Relates to the form of primary ballots; removes color requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.66 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.904 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5839 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.458 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05839 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.66