NY A07693 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits sentences for two or more crimes to run consecutively, when one of such crimes is a homicide.
Title
Permits sentences for two or more crimes to run consecutively, when one of such crimes is a homicide.
Sponsors
Asm. Frank Skartados [D] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Kieran Lalor [R] | Asm. Brian Barnwell [D] |
Asm. Edward Ra [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | print number 7693a |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |