NY A07711 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - amended on third reading 7711d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - amended on third reading 7711d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the Cedarmore corporation for certain public purposes which shall preserve and protect the endangered natural habitat, including, but not limited to, the water supply, indigenous wildlife, flora and fauna; imposes restrictive convenants whereby the commissioner of general services is authorized to fix and determine the terms and conditions of the conveyance, sale or transfer including, but not limited to, restrictive covenants in the deed that state that: the building may not be demolished; the building may only be used for activities that are congruent with public and civic activities; and the building may not be used for any sectarian and/or any non-secular purposes.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the Cedarmore corporation for certain public purposes which shall preserve and protect the endangered natural habitat, including, but not limited to, the water supply, indigenous wildlife, flora and fauna; imposes restrictive convenants whereby the commissioner of general services is authorized to fix and determine the terms and conditions of the conveyance, sale or transfer including, but not limited to, restrictive covenants in the deed that state that: the building may not be demolished; the building may only be used for activities that are congruent with public and civic activities; and the building may not be used for any sectarian and/or any non-secular purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7711d |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 7711c |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.544 |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7711b |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.69 |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.69 |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | print number 7711a |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06318 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT