NY A07786 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the exclusion of coverage for losses or damages caused by exposure to lead-based paint; provides that no insurer licensed or permitted by the superintendent to provide liability coverage to rental property owners shall exclude coverage for losses or damages caused by exposure to lead-based paint.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the exclusion of coverage for losses or damages caused by exposure to lead-based paint; provides that no insurer licensed or permitted by the superintendent to provide liability coverage to rental property owners shall exclude coverage for losses or damages caused by exposure to lead-based paint.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.550 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.246 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.246 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | referred to insurance |