NY A08083 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - approval memo.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to develop guidelines for vegetation management plans to be used by persons or corporations that make claims that they provide pollinator protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to develop guidelines for vegetation management plans to be used by persons or corporations that make claims that they provide pollinator protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senateapproval memo.9
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.399
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.668
2018-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6339A
2018-05-16SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
2018-05-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-16Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-10Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.874
2018-05-08Assemblyreported
2018-02-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-02-01Assemblyprint number 8083a
2018-02-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to agriculture
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2017-05-25Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S06339 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8083A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08083
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08083A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8083#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback