NY A08257 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a funeral director or undertaker employed by or contracting with an institution accepting unclaimed cadavers or anatomical gifts shall acquire the death and burial certificates for such cadavers.
Title
Provides that a funeral director or undertaker employed by or contracting with an institution accepting unclaimed cadavers or anatomical gifts shall acquire the death and burial certificates for such cadavers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.607 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.607 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05945 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH