NY A08325 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the disqualification of a surviving spouse if the marriage is annulled or voided after the death of the spouse.
Title
Provides for the disqualification of a surviving spouse if the marriage is annulled or voided after the death of the spouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1008 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06640 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY