NY A08360 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7991
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7991
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing Konbit Neg Lakay Inc. of Spring Valley to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Title
Relates to authorizing Konbit Neg Lakay Inc. of Spring Valley to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7991 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.49 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.49 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07991 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.442