NY S07991 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing Konbit Neg Lakay Inc. of Spring Valley to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing Konbit Neg Lakay Inc. of Spring Valley to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.442
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.49
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a8360
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1866
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-16SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A08360 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7991

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback