NY A08385 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-07 - print number 8385a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-07 - print number 8385a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.
Title
Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Micah Kellner [D] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Assembly | print number 8385a |
2012-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04107 (Same As) 2012-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 4107A