NY A08575 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would enhance the ability of the Dormitory Authority of the State of New York ("DASNY") to meet the tax-exempt financing and construction needs of not-for-profit entities that conduct activities in the State of New York and that are exempt from federal income tax under United States Internal Revenue Code ("IRC") 501-(c)(3).
Title
Relates to the powers and duties of the dormitory authority for the financing and construction of certain not-for-profit corporations and entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-17 | print number 8575a | |
2009-06-17 | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions | |
2009-05-28 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |