NY A08575 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to restrictions on non-therapeutic use of antimicrobial agents in animals in the absence of any clinical sign of disease in the animals.
Title
Relates to restrictions on non-therapeutic use of antimicrobial agents in animals in the absence of any clinical sign of disease in the animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S01844 (Same As) 2017-01-11 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
S07037 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
S07037 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE