NY A08684 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - signed chap.205
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the presence of a companion animal when executing a warrant for eviction or dispossession of property and directs the executing officer to make arrangements for the safe removal of such animal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the presence of a companion animal when executing a warrant for eviction or dispossession of property and directs the executing officer to make arrangements for the safe removal of such animal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-23Senatesigned chap.205
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.354
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7388B
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-04Assemblyamended on third reading 8684b
2018-05-10Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.875
2018-05-08Assemblyreported
2018-02-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-02-22Assemblyprint number 8684a
2018-02-22Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2017-09-25Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S07388 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8684B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08684&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08684&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08684
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08684&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08684A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08684&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08684B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08684&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08684&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8684#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08684&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback