NY A08823 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-16 - signed chap.373
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-16 - signed chap.373
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals certain sections of the general municipal law, in relation to urban renewal agencies and industrial development agencies; transfers any books, records and remaining rights of any dissolved facility to an identifiable location.
Title
Repeals certain sections of the general municipal law, in relation to urban renewal agencies and industrial development agencies; transfers any books, records and remaining rights of any dissolved facility to an identifiable location.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Senate | signed chap.373 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.357 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5227B |
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.298 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.298 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-08 | Assembly | print number 8823a |
2012-06-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05227 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8823A