NY A08902 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - print number 8902b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - print number 8902b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to owner liability for failure of an operator to comply with street cleaning parking rules; relates to access to records prepared pursuant to street cleaning parking rules.
Title
Relates to owner liability for failure of an operator to comply with street cleaning parking rules; relates to access to records prepared pursuant to street cleaning parking rules.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Cunningham [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Grace Lee [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Assembly | print number 8902b |
2024-04-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | print number 8902a |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2024-01-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08756 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION