NY A08975 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for persons engaged in the practice of nail specialty, waxing, natural hair styling, esthetics and cosmetology.
Title
Requires domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for persons engaged in the practice of nail specialty, waxing, natural hair styling, esthetics and cosmetology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.71 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-26 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-02-26 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-24 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.406 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | substituted for a8975 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.93 |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | substituted by s7169 |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.406 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07169 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.71