NY A09123 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - substituted by s3779
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - substituted by s3779
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions allowing any individual to make not more than three mortgage loans, nor more than five in a two year period, to family members without requiring an individual to obtain a mortgage banking license.
Title
Makes provisions allowing any individual to make not more than three mortgage loans, nor more than five in a two year period, to family members without requiring an individual to obtain a mortgage banking license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Assembly | substituted by s3779 |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.521 |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-25 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S03779 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - SIGNED CHAP.47