NY A09668 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the liability of the state to any person who suffers damage as a result of a defect in a state highway.
Title
Relates to the liability of the state to any person who suffers damage as a result of a defect in a state highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07913 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION