NY A10077 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Community Mainstreaming Associates, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes Community Mainstreaming Associates, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.155 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.946 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8702 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.137 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.137 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08702 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.155