NY A10086 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-02 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-02 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of education to apportion and pay aid to the Jordan Elbridge central school district for prior expenditures for employee benefits.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of education to apportion and pay aid to the Jordan Elbridge central school district for prior expenditures for employee benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-02 | Senate | tabled |
2012-08-01 | Senate | vetoed memo.134 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1417 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7343 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.236 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.236 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07343 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10086