NY A10141 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7888
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7888
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fireworks, dangerous fireworks and sparkling devices.
Title
Relates to fireworks, dangerous fireworks and sparkling devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7888 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.583 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07888 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.12