NY A10611 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - SIGNED CHAP.96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - SIGNED CHAP.96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disclosure of law enforcement disciplinary records.
Title
Relates to the disclosure of law enforcement disciplinary records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.96 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.67 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | substituted for a10611 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.751 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s8496 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.67 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.67 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08496 (Same As) 2020-06-12 - SIGNED CHAP.96