NY A11158 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - signed chap.78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - signed chap.78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an airport mass transit project at LaGuardia airport.
Title
Authorizes an airport mass transit project at LaGuardia airport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | signed chap.78 |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2086 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.291 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.291 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to cities |