NY S00323 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Aids in the transition to adulthood for children with medical fragility living in pediatric nursing homes and other settings.
Title
Aids in the transition to adulthood for children with medical fragility living in pediatric nursing homes and other settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-02-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |